Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1727 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/26/2017

                            S.B. No. 1727


 AN ACT
 relating to the procedure for an election to adopt a sales and use
 tax or to change the tax rate in an emergency services district.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 775.0751(c-1), Health and Safety Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (c-1)  A district that otherwise would be precluded from
 adopting a sales and use tax under Subsection (c) may adopt a sales
 and use tax, change the rate of its sales and use tax, or abolish its
 sales and use tax at an election held as provided by Section
 775.0752, if the board:
 (1)  excludes from the [election and the] applicability
 of any proposed sales and use tax any territory in the district
 where the sales and use tax is then at two percent; and
 (2)  not later than the 30th day after the date on which
 the board issues the election order, gives, for informational
 purposes, written or oral notice on the proposed imposition,
 increase, or abolition of the sales and use tax, including the
 reasons for the proposed change, to the commissioners court of each
 county in which the district is located.
 SECTION 2.  Section 775.0752, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (f) to read as follows:
 (f)  At an election described by Section 775.0751(c-1) to
 adopt the tax, the ballot shall be prepared to permit voting for or
 against the proposition:  "The adoption of a local sales and use tax
 in (name of district) at a rate not to exceed (proposed tax rate)
 percent in any location in the district."
 SECTION 3.  The acts and proceedings of an emergency
 services district relating to an election described by Section
 775.0751(c-1), Health and Safety Code, to impose a sales and use tax
 that was held November 3, 2015, and at which the ballot proposition
 used language from Section 775.0752, Health and Safety Code, and
 was approved by a majority of the voters voting on the proposition
 are validated as of the dates they occurred. The validation
 includes the preparation and wording of the ballot proposition, any
 action taken by the district in calling, holding, and canvassing
 the tax election, and any other action taken by the district before
 the effective date of this Act in connection with the imposition of
 the tax approved in the tax election. A district may take any
 further action or conduct any further proceeding necessary to
 complete the imposition of the tax approved at the tax election.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1727 passed the Senate on
 May 4, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 29, Nays 2.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1727 passed the House on
 May 24, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 144, Nays 2, two
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor