Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1729 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/26/2017

                    By: Birdwell S.B. No. 1729
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2017; March 23, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 April 26, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 26, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1729 By:  Creighton


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the reporting and disposition of certain state-owned
 real property.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 2166, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 2166.109, 2166.110, and 2166.111 to read
 as follows:
 Sec. 2166.109.  CONSOLIDATED DATABASE OF STATE-OWNED REAL
 PROPERTY ASSETS. (a)  Notwithstanding Section 2166.003, this
 section applies to all state agencies, including a state agency
 otherwise exempt from this chapter under that section, other than a
 state institution of higher education.
 (b)  The commission shall establish and maintain a
 centralized, consolidated database for state-owned real property
 assets. The commission shall design the database to provide a broad
 overview of state agency real property assets and require state
 agencies to provide more generalized, less detailed information on
 real property assets than is required under Subchapter E, Chapter
 31, Natural Resources Code.
 (c)  The commission by rule shall prescribe:
 (1)  the information required for the database and the
 form for a state agency to provide the information;
 (2)  the responsibilities and access rights of the
 commission and other state agencies related to the database; and
 (3)  a schedule for establishing the database and for
 state agencies to submit information to the commission for
 inclusion in the database.
 (d)  Each state agency shall submit to the commission in
 accordance with commission rules:
 (1)  not later than September 30 of each even-numbered
 year, the agency's inventory of state-owned real property assets
 current as of the last day of the most recent state fiscal year; and
 (2)  not later than the 90th day after the date of the
 occurrence, a description of any acquisition, disposition, or
 significant change in condition or status of a real property asset
 included in the agency's inventory.
 Sec. 2166.110.  BIENNIAL REPORT. Not later than December 1
 of each even-numbered year, the commission shall submit a report to
 the governor and legislature on the status of all state-owned real
 property assets included in the database maintained under Section
 2166.109.
 Sec. 2166.111.  DISPOSITION OF STATE-OWNED REAL PROPERTY.
 (a)  A state agency in the executive branch of state government
 shall notify the commission at least 60 days before the date of any
 planned sale, lease, exchange, or other disposition of a
 state-owned real property asset included in the agency's inventory
 under Section 2166.109.
 (b)  Not later than the 30th day after the date of receiving
 notice from a state agency under Subsection (a), the commission
 shall submit to the state agency and governor a recommendation on
 whether the property is suitable to meet an identified space need of
 another state agency.
 (c)  A state agency may not sell, lease, exchange, or
 otherwise dispose of property the commission recommends as suitable
 to meet an identified space need of another state agency unless the
 governor, in writing, authorizes the agency to proceed with the
 sale, lease, exchange, or other disposition.
 (d)  This section does not apply to the disposition of a
 state highway right-of-way or to any legislative action directing
 the disposition of state-owned real property.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  The Texas Facilities Commission is required
 to implement this Act only if the legislature appropriates money
 specifically for that purpose.  If the legislature does not
 appropriate money specifically for that purpose, the commission
 may, but is not required to, implement this Act using other
 appropriations available for that purpose.
 (b)  A state agency is not required to comply with Section
 2166.109 or 2166.111, Government Code, as added by this Act, until
 the Texas Facilities Commission has established the database and
 adopted the rules required by Section 2166.109, Government Code.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *