Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1735 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/26/2017

                            S.B. No. 1735


 AN ACT
 relating to the repeal of certain obsolete laws governing state
 pensions and other similar benefits.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  FINDINGS. The legislature finds that certain
 laws governing state pension and other benefits have become
 obsolete and should no longer be included in the reported statutes
 of this state.  These laws consist of:
 (1)  part of the enabling legislation for state
 pensions for Confederate veterans and their surviving spouses;
 (2)  authorization of a state pension for veterans of
 the Texas Revolution and their surviving spouses;
 (3)  authorization of a state pension for certain Texas
 Rangers who served before September 1, 1947, and their surviving
 spouses; and
 (4)  several statutes from the 1930s providing
 transitional funding mechanisms and appropriations for the
 original Texas Old Age Assistance Fund.
 SECTION 2.  REPEALER. The following provisions are
 repealed:
 (1)  Articles 6205, 6208, 6209, 6210, 6211, 6212, 6213,
 6214, 6215, 6217, 6218, 6220, 6221, 6222, 6223, 6224, 6225, 6226,
 and 6227, Revised Statutes;
 (2)  Chapter 557 (S.B. 433), Acts of the 51st
 Legislature, Regular Session, 1949 (Article 6227a, Vernon's Texas
 Civil Statutes);
 (3)  Chapter 283 (S.B. 53), Acts of the 56th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 1959 (Article 6228e, Vernon's Texas
 Civil Statutes);
 (4)  Section 1, Article 1, Chapter 495 (H.B. 8), Acts of
 the 44th Legislature, 3rd Called Session, 1936 (Article 6243-2,
 Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes);
 (5)  Chapter 479 (S.B. 8), Acts of the 44th
 Legislature, 3rd Called Session, 1936 (Article 6243-22, Vernon's
 Texas Civil Statutes);
 (6)  Chapter 496 (H.B. 37), Acts of the 44th
 Legislature, 3rd Called Session, 1936 (Article 6243-23, Vernon's
 Texas Civil Statutes); and
 (7)  Chapter 1 (H.B. 179), page 536, General Laws, Acts
 of the 46th Legislature, Regular Session, 1939 (Article 6243-24,
 Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes).
 SECTION 3.  EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution.  If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1735 passed the Senate on
 April 19, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1735 passed the House on
 May 24, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 146, Nays 0, two
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor