Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1736 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/18/2017

                    By: Hughes S.B. No. 1736
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2017; March 23, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 18, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 2; April 18, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1736 By:  Hughes


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the liability of a person who allows handguns to be
 carried on property owned, controlled, or managed by the person.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Title 4, Civil Practice and Remedies Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 95A to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 95A.  LIMITED LIABILITY FOR CERTAIN PERSONS WHO ALLOW
 HANDGUNS
 Sec. 95A.001.  DEFINITION. In this chapter, "license
 holder" means a person licensed to carry a handgun under Subchapter
 H, Chapter 411, Government Code.
 Sec. 95A.002.  LIMITED LIABILITY FOR CERTAIN PERSONS WHO
 ALLOW HANDGUNS. A person, including a business or other entity, who
 owns, controls, or manages property and who has authority to forbid
 the carrying of handguns on the property is immune from civil
 liability with respect to any claim that is based on the person's
 failure to exercise the option to forbid the carrying of handguns by
 a license holder on the property by providing notice under Sections
 30.06 and 30.07, Penal Code.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 95A, Civil Practice and Remedies Code,
 as added by this Act, does not apply to a cause of action that
 accrued before the effective date of this Act.  A cause of action
 that accrued before the effective date of this Act is governed by
 the law applicable to the cause of action immediately before that
 date, and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *