Senate | 05/04/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Posting rule suspended | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | Referred to Education | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |