Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1793 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/04/2017

                            By: Menéndez S.B. No. 1793
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2017; March 23, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 May 4, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 4, 2017, sent
 to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1793 By:  Perry


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to complaints filed against certain law enforcement
 officers, peace officers, detention officers, county jailers, and
 fire fighters.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 614, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 614.0205 to read as follows:
 Sec. 614.0205.  DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Complaint" means an allegation that a law
 enforcement officer or fire fighter has committed misconduct or has
 violated a policy of the law enforcement agency or fire department
 that appointed or employs the officer or employee.
 (2)  "Law enforcement agency" means an agency of this
 state or an agency of a political subdivision of this state
 authorized by law to appoint or employ a law enforcement officer.
 (3)  "Law enforcement officer" means a peace officer
 under Article 2.12, Code of Criminal Procedure, or other law or a
 detention officer or county jailer.
 SECTION 2.  Section 614.021(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (b), this subchapter
 applies only to a complaint against:
 (1)  a law enforcement officer appointed or employed by
 a law enforcement agency [of the State of Texas, including an
 officer of the Department of Public Safety or of the Texas Alcoholic
 Beverage Commission]; or
 (2)  a fire fighter [who is] employed by this state or a
 political subdivision of this state[;
 [(3)     a peace officer under Article 2.12, Code of
 Criminal Procedure, or other law who is appointed or employed by a
 political subdivision of this state; or
 [(4)     a detention officer or county jailer who is
 appointed or employed by a political subdivision of this state].
 SECTION 3.  Section 614.022, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 614.022.  COMPLAINT TO BE IN WRITING AND SIGNED BY
 COMPLAINANT. (a)  To be considered by the head of a law enforcement
 [state] agency or by the head of a fire department [or local law
 enforcement agency], the complaint must be:
 (1)  in writing; [and]
 (2)  signed by the person making the complaint; and
 (3)  filed with:
 (A)  the head of the law enforcement agency or
 fire department or that person's designee; or
 (B)  an independent entity responsible for
 receiving the complaint.
 (b)  Any person, including a law enforcement officer or an
 employee of a law enforcement agency or fire department, may file a
 complaint under this section.
 SECTION 4.  Sections 614.023(a) and (b), Government Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A copy of a signed complaint against an officer or
 employee to whom this subchapter applies [a law enforcement officer
 of this state or a fire fighter, detention officer, county jailer,
 or peace officer appointed or employed by a political subdivision
 of this state] shall be given to the officer or employee within a
 reasonable time after the complaint is filed.
 (b)  Disciplinary action may not be taken against the officer
 or employee unless:
 (1)  a signed complaint against the officer or employee
 is filed; and
 (2)  a copy of the [signed] complaint is given to the
 officer or employee not later than 36 hours before the disciplinary
 action is taken.
 SECTION 5.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a complaint relating to conduct that occurs on or after the
 effective date of this Act. A complaint relating to conduct that
 occurs before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law
 in effect on the date the conduct occurred, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *