House | 05/17/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3529 | |
House | 05/01/2017 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 2187 | |
House | 05/01/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2187 | |
House | 04/06/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1423 | |
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 959 | |
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 926 | |
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 926 | |
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 926 | |
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 926 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 919 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 919 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 919 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Amended | Journal Page: 919 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | FA4 West | Journal Page: 918 |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Vote reconsidered | Journal Page: 917 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Reason for vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 881 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 881 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 881 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Amendment fails of adoption | Journal Page: 880 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 Menndez | Journal Page: 880 |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Amended | Journal Page: 880 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 878 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 878 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/15/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 545 | |
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 525 | |
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 328 | |
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 190 | |
Senate | 01/31/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 151 | |
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 138 | |
Senate | 01/24/2017 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 91 | |
Senate | 01/24/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 91 | |
Senate | 01/19/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/19/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |