Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1862 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/10/2017

                            85R7059 JG-D
 By: Lucio S.B. No. 1862


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the development of initiatives to reduce veteran
 suicides in this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a) The Texas Veterans Commission shall
 collaborate with the Department of State Health Services to:
 (1)  identify proactive steps that can be taken through
 agency rulemaking to strengthen the state's efforts to reduce
 veteran suicides, including increasing suicide prevention training
 requirements for mental health professionals; and
 (2)  develop for consideration by the legislature
 initiatives and recommendations to reduce veteran suicides and
 increase the availability of and access to mental health services,
 including suicide prevention services, for veterans in this state.
 (b)  Not later than November 1, 2017, the Texas Veterans
 Commission and the Department of State Health Services shall begin
 collaborating as described by Subsection (a) of this section.
 (c)  Not later than November 1, 2018, the Texas Veterans
 Commission and the Department of State Health Services shall submit
 a written or electronic report to the governor and the legislature
 on the steps identified and initiatives and recommendations
 developed under Subsection (a) of this section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act expires September 1, 2019.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.