Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1877 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/06/2017

                    By: Perry S.B. No. 1877
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2017; March 23, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 6, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 6, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to sending notice of proposed contracts for highway
 projects by e-mail.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 223.003, Transportation
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 223.003.  NOTICE OF PROPOSED CONTRACTS [BY MAIL].
 SECTION 2.  Sections 223.003(a), (b), and (c),
 Transportation Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A person may apply to have the name of the person placed
 on a [mailing] list to receive notice of any proposed contracts.
 (b)  The department shall send [mail] the notice to each
 person on that [mailing] list. The department may send the notice
 by mail or electronically to an e-mail address designated by the
 person.
 (c)  The department may require each applicant to pay an
 annual subscription fee set by the department in an amount not to
 exceed the average annual costs of sending [mailing] notices to the
 applicant.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *