House | 05/03/2017 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2454 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2454 | |
House | 04/24/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1801 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1261 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1225 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1225 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1225 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1225 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1225 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1225 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Amended | Journal Page: 1225 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 Uresti | Journal Page: 1224 |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1224 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1223 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1145 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1142 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/25/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 115 | |
Senate | 01/25/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 115 | |
Senate | 11/14/2016 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/14/2016 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |