House | 05/17/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3529 | |
House | 05/01/2017 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 2187 | |
House | 05/01/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2187 | |
House | 04/05/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1109 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 921 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 882 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 882 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 882 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 882 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 882 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Amended | Journal Page: 882 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Schwertner | Journal Page: 881 |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 881 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 881 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 746 | |
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 138 | |
Senate | 01/24/2017 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 91 | |
Senate | 01/24/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 91 | |
Senate | 01/19/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/19/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |