E
|
06/09/2017
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/09/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4244
|
E
|
05/28/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4213
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6032
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3794
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3699
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5093
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3291
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3291
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3291
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3291
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2140
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1370
|
Journal Page: 3798
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3798
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Wu
|
Journal Page: 3798
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3798
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3729
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3729
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3456
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 2755
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2755
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1767
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1261
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1212
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1212
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1212
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1212
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1212
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1212
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1212
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1146
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2017
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 115
|
Senate
|
01/25/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 115
|
Senate
|
11/14/2016
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2016
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|