Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1910 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/26/2017

                            S.B. No. 1910


 AN ACT
 relating to state agency information security plans, information
 technology employees, and online and mobile applications.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 2054, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 2054.0591 and 2054.0592 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 2054.0591.  CYBERSECURITY REPORT.  (a)  Not later than
 November 15 of each even-numbered year, the department shall submit
 to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house
 of representatives, and the standing committee of each house of the
 legislature with primary jurisdiction over state government
 operations a report identifying preventive and recovery efforts the
 state can undertake to improve cybersecurity in this state.  The
 report must include:
 (1)  an assessment of the resources available to
 address the operational and financial impacts of a cybersecurity
 event;
 (2)  a review of existing statutes regarding
 cybersecurity and information resources technologies;
 (3)  recommendations for legislative action to
 increase the state's cybersecurity and protect against adverse
 impacts from a cybersecurity event;
 (4)  an evaluation of the costs and benefits of
 cybersecurity insurance; and
 (5)  an evaluation of tertiary disaster recovery
 options.
 (b)  The department or a recipient of a report under this
 section may redact or withhold information confidential under
 Chapter 552, including Section 552.139, or other state or federal
 law that is contained in the report in response to a request under
 Chapter 552 without the necessity of requesting a decision from the
 attorney general under Subchapter G, Chapter 552.
 Sec. 2054.0592.  CYBERSECURITY EMERGENCY FUNDING.  If a
 cybersecurity event creates a need for emergency funding, the
 department may request that the governor or Legislative Budget
 Board make a proposal under Chapter 317 to provide funding to manage
 the operational and financial impacts from the cybersecurity event.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter F, Chapter 2054, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2054.1184 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2054.1184.  ASSESSMENT OF MAJOR INFORMATION RESOURCES
 PROJECT. (a)  A state agency proposing to spend appropriated funds
 for a major information resources project must first conduct an
 execution capability assessment to:
 (1)  determine the agency's capability for implementing
 the project;
 (2)  reduce the agency's financial risk in implementing
 the project; and
 (3)  increase the probability of the agency's
 successful implementation of the project.
 (b)  A state agency shall submit to the department, the
 quality assurance team established under Section 2054.158, and the
 Legislative Budget Board a detailed report that identifies the
 agency's organizational strengths and any weaknesses that will be
 addressed before the agency initially spends appropriated funds for
 a major information resources project.
 (c)  A state agency may contract with an independent third
 party to conduct the assessment under Subsection (a) and prepare
 the report described by Subsection (b).
 SECTION 3.  Section 2054.133(c), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (c)  Not later than October 15 of each even-numbered year,
 each state agency shall submit a copy of the agency's information
 security plan to the department. Subject to available resources,
 the department may select a portion of the submitted security plans
 to be assessed by the department in accordance with department
 rules.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter F, Chapter 2054, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2054.136 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2054.136.  DESIGNATED INFORMATION SECURITY OFFICER.
 Each state agency shall designate an information security officer
 who:
 (1)  reports to the agency's executive-level
 management;
 (2)  has authority over information security for the
 entire agency;
 (3)  possesses the training and experience required to
 perform the duties required by department rules; and
 (4)  to the extent feasible, has information security
 duties as the officer's primary duties.
 SECTION 5.  Subchapter N-1, Chapter 2054, Government Code,
 is amended by adding Sections 2054.516 and 2054.517 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 2054.516.  DATA SECURITY PLAN FOR ONLINE AND MOBILE
 APPLICATIONS. (a)  Each state agency, other than an institution of
 higher education subject to Section 2054.517, implementing an
 Internet website or mobile application that processes any sensitive
 personally identifiable or confidential information must:
 (1)  submit a biennial data security plan to the
 department not later than October 15 of each even-numbered year, to
 establish planned beta testing for websites or applications; and
 (2)  subject the website or application to a
 vulnerability and penetration test and address any vulnerability
 identified in the test.
 (b)  The department shall review each data security plan
 submitted under Subsection (a) and make any recommendations for
 changes to the plan to the state agency as soon as practicable after
 the department reviews the plan.
 Sec. 2054.517.  DATA SECURITY PROCEDURES FOR ONLINE AND
 MOBILE APPLICATIONS OF INSTITUTIONS OF HIGHER EDUCATION. (a)  Each
 institution of higher education, as defined by Section 61.003,
 Education Code, shall adopt and implement a policy for Internet
 website and mobile application security procedures that complies
 with this section.
 (b)  Before deploying an Internet website or mobile
 application that processes confidential information for an
 institution of higher education, the developer of the website or
 application for the institution must submit to the institution's
 information security officer the information required under
 policies adopted by the institution to protect the privacy of
 individuals by preserving the confidentiality of information
 processed by the website or application. At a minimum, the
 institution's policies must require the developer to submit
 information describing:
 (1)  the architecture of the website or application;
 (2)  the authentication mechanism for the website or
 application; and
 (3)  the administrator-level access to data included in
 the website or application.
 (c)  Before deploying an Internet website or mobile
 application described by Subsection (b), an institution of higher
 education must subject the website or application to a
 vulnerability and penetration test conducted internally or by an
 independent third party.
 (d)  Each institution of higher education shall submit to the
 department the policies adopted as required by Subsection (b).  The
 department shall review the policies and make recommendations for
 appropriate changes.
 SECTION 6.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the Department of Information Resources shall adopt
 the rules necessary to implement Section 2054.133(c), Government
 Code, as amended by this Act.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1910 passed the Senate on
 May 4, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendments on May 26, 2017, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1910 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 22, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 144,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor