House | 05/19/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Posting rule suspended | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Referred to Public Health | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Read first time | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | Referred to Health & Human Services | ||
Senate | 03/10/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |