By: Kolkhorst S.B. No. 1929 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2017; March 27, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services; April 24, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 24, 2017, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1929 By: Kolkhorst A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to maternal mortality and morbidity and pregnancy-related deaths, including postpartum depression. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 34.005, Health and Safety Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 34.005. DUTIES OF TASK FORCE. The task force shall: (1) study and review: (A) cases of pregnancy-related deaths; and (B) trends, rates, or disparities in maternal mortality and in severe maternal morbidity; (2) determine the feasibility of the task force studying cases of severe maternal morbidity; and (3) make recommendations to help reduce the incidence of pregnancy-related deaths and severe maternal morbidity in this state. SECTION 2. Sections 34.007(a) and (b), Health and Safety Code, are amended to read as follows: (a) The department shall determine a statistically significant number of cases of pregnancy-related deaths for review. The department shall either randomly select cases or select all cases for the task force to review under this subsection to reflect a cross-section of pregnancy-related deaths in this state. (b) The department shall statistically analyze aggregate data of pregnancy-related deaths and severe maternal morbidity in this state to identify any trends, rates, or disparities. SECTION 3. Chapter 34, Health and Safety Code, is amended by adding Section 34.0155 to read as follows: Sec. 34.0155. REPORT ON MATERNAL MORTALITY AND PREGNANCY-RELATED DEATHS. The commission shall: (1) evaluate options for reducing maternal mortality, focusing on the most prevalent causes of maternal mortality as identified in the task force's biennial report required under Section 34.015, and for treating postpartum depression in economically disadvantaged women; (2) submit a written report that summarizes the commission's efforts to accomplish the tasks described by Subdivision (1) to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, the Legislative Budget Board, and the appropriate standing committees of the legislature not later than December 1 of each even-numbered year; and (3) to the extent authorized by state and federal law, apply for federal money to fund the screening and treatment of postpartum depression under Section 10005 of the 21st Century Cures Act (42 U.S.C. Section 201 et seq.) and consider the recommendations contained in the task force's biennial report in using any federal grant money received. SECTION 4. Section 34.018, Health and Safety Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 34.018. SUNSET PROVISION. The task force is subject to Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas Sunset Act). Unless continued in existence as provided by that chapter, the task force is abolished and this chapter expires December 31, 2023 [September 1, 2019]. SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. * * * * *