Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1937 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/03/2017

                            By: Hughes S.B. No. 1937
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2017; March 27, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 May 3, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 0; May 3, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the participation of certain counties in the collection
 improvement program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 103.0033(b), Code of Criminal Procedure,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  This article applies only to:
 (1)  a county with a population of 100,000 [50,000] or
 greater; and
 (2)  a municipality with a population of 100,000 or
 greater.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *