Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1943 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/11/2017

                    By: Hughes S.B. No. 1943
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2017; March 27, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 11, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 11, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to restrictive covenants regarding firearms or firearms
 ammunition.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 202, Property Code, is amended by adding
 Section 202.020 to read as follows:
 Sec. 202.020.  REGULATION OF FIREARMS OR FIREARMS
 AMMUNITION.  A property owners' association may not include or
 enforce a provision in a dedicatory instrument that prohibits,
 restricts, or has the effect of prohibiting or restricting any
 person who is otherwise authorized from lawfully possessing,
 transporting, or storing a firearm, any part of a firearm, or
 firearm ammunition, as well as the otherwise lawful discharge of a
 firearm.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *