Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1945 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/26/2017

                            By: Hughes S.B. No. 1945
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2017; March 27, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 26, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 26, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1945 By:  Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the Texas Uniform Trade Secrets Act.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 134A.002, Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended by adding Subdivisions (1-a), (3-a), and (7) and
 amending Subdivisions (3), (4), and (6) to read as follows:
 (1-a)  "Clear and convincing" means the measure or
 degree of proof that will produce in the mind of the trier of fact a
 firm belief or conviction as to the truth of the allegations sought
 to be established.
 (3)  "Misappropriation" means:
 (A)  acquisition of a trade secret of another by a
 person who knows or has reason to know that the trade secret was
 acquired by improper means; or
 (B)  disclosure or use of a trade secret of
 another without express or implied consent by a person who:
 (i)  used improper means to acquire
 knowledge of the trade secret;
 (ii)  at the time of disclosure or use, knew
 or had reason to know that the person's knowledge of the trade
 secret was:
 (a)  derived from or through a person
 who used [had utilized] improper means to acquire the trade secret
 [it];
 (b)  acquired under circumstances
 giving rise to a duty to maintain the [its] secrecy of or limit the
 [its] use of the trade secret; or
 (c)  derived from or through a person
 who owed a duty to the person seeking relief to maintain the [its]
 secrecy of or limit the [its] use of the trade secret; or
 (iii)  before a material change of the
 position of the person [person's position], knew or had reason to
 know that the trade secret [it] was a trade secret and that
 knowledge of the trade secret [it] had been acquired by accident or
 mistake.
 (3-a)  "Owner" means, with respect to a trade secret,
 the person or entity in whom or in which rightful, legal, or
 equitable title to, or the right to enforce rights in, the trade
 secret is reposed.
 (4)  "Proper means" means discovery by independent
 development, reverse engineering unless prohibited, or any other
 means that is not improper means.
 (6)  "Trade secret" means all forms and types of
 information, including business, scientific, technical, economic,
 or engineering information, and any [a] formula, design, prototype,
 pattern, plan, compilation, program device, program, code, device,
 method, technique, process, procedure, financial data, or list of
 actual or potential customers or suppliers, whether tangible or
 intangible and whether or how stored, compiled, or memorialized
 physically, electronically, graphically, photographically, or in
 writing if [that]:
 (A)  the owner of the trade secret has taken
 reasonable measures under the circumstances to keep the information
 secret; and
 (B)  the information derives independent economic
 value, actual or potential, from not being generally known to, and
 not being readily ascertainable through [by] proper means by,
 another person [other persons] who can obtain economic value from
 the [its] disclosure or use of the information [; and
 [(B)     is the subject of efforts that are
 reasonable under the circumstances to maintain its secrecy].
 (7)  "Willful and malicious misappropriation" means
 intentional misappropriation resulting from the conscious
 disregard of the rights of the owner of the trade secret.
 SECTION 2.  Section 134A.003, Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection
 (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a)  Actual or threatened misappropriation may be enjoined
 if the order does not prohibit a person from using general
 knowledge, skill, and experience that person acquired during
 employment.
 (a-1)  On application to the court, an injunction shall be
 terminated when the trade secret has ceased to exist, but the
 injunction may be continued for an additional reasonable period of
 time in order to eliminate commercial advantage that otherwise
 would be derived from the misappropriation.
 SECTION 3.  Section 134A.004(b), Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  If willful [wilful] and malicious misappropriation is
 proven by clear and convincing evidence, the fact finder may award
 exemplary damages in an amount not exceeding twice any award made
 under Subsection (a).
 SECTION 4.  Section 134A.005, Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 134A.005.  ATTORNEY'S FEES.  The court may award
 reasonable attorney's fees to the prevailing party if:
 (1)  a claim of misappropriation is made in bad faith;
 (2)  a motion to terminate an injunction is made or
 resisted in bad faith; or
 (3)  willful [wilful] and malicious misappropriation
 exists.
 SECTION 5.  Section 134A.006, Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 134A.006.  PRESERVATION OF SECRECY.  (a)  In an action
 under this chapter, a court shall preserve the secrecy of an alleged
 trade secret by reasonable means. There is a presumption in favor
 of granting protective orders to preserve the secrecy of trade
 secrets. Protective orders may include provisions limiting access
 to confidential information to only the attorneys and their
 experts, holding in camera hearings, sealing the records of the
 action, and ordering any person involved in the litigation not to
 disclose an alleged trade secret without prior court approval.
 (b)  In an action under this chapter, a presumption exists
 that a party is allowed to participate and assist counsel in the
 presentation of the party's case. At any stage of the action, the
 court may exclude a party and the party's representative or limit a
 party's access to the alleged trade secret of another party if other
 countervailing interests overcome the presumption. In making this
 determination, the court must conduct a balancing test that
 considers:
 (1)  the value of an owner's alleged trade secret;
 (2)  the degree of competitive harm an owner would
 suffer from the dissemination of the owner's alleged trade secret
 to the other party;
 (3)  whether the owner is alleging that the other party
 is already in possession of the alleged trade secret;
 (4)  whether a party's representative acts as a
 competitive decision maker;
 (5)  the degree to which a party's defense would be
 impaired by limiting that party's access to the alleged trade
 secret;
 (6)  whether a party or a party's representative
 possesses specialized expertise that would not be available to a
 party's outside expert; and
 (7)  the stage of the action.
 SECTION 6.  Chapter 134A, Civil Practice and Remedies Code,
 as amended by this Act, applies only to an action that commences on
 or after the effective date of this Act. An action that commences
 before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law
 applicable to the action immediately before the effective date of
 this Act, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *