E
|
06/15/2017
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4246
|
E
|
05/28/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4213
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6033
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3794
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4213
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5571
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3593
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3592
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3592
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3592
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2965
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4636
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1747
|
Journal Page: 4635
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4635
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4635
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 4580
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4525
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 4524
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
1 hr. notice-for reconsideration
|
|
Journal Page: 4513
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4508
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1688
|
Journal Page: 4507
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Failed to pass to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4507
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Springer
|
Journal Page: 4507
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4507
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4004
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 3018
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3018
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2297
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1638
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1541
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1541
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1541
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1541
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1506
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1506
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1506
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1285
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1261
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 341
|
Senate
|
01/25/2017
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 116
|
Senate
|
01/25/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 116
|
Senate
|
11/14/2016
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2016
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|