Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1963 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/09/2017

                    By: Creighton S.B. No. 1963
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2017; March 27, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; May 9, 2017,
 reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0;
 May 9, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requirements for educator preparation program support
 for certain candidates for certification.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 21.044, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (f-1) to read as follows:
 (f-1)  Board rules addressing ongoing educator preparation
 program support for a candidate seeking certification in a
 certification class other than classroom teacher may not require
 that an educator preparation program conduct one or more formal
 observations of the candidate on the candidate's site in a
 face-to-face setting. The rules must permit each required formal
 observation to occur on the candidate's site or through use of
 electronic transmission or other video-based or technology-based
 method.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *