Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1963 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2017

Engrossed

Bill May 15, 2017

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2017
Bill May 9, 2017