Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1987 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2017

Engrossed

Bill April 11, 2017

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2017
Bill April 5, 2017