Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1990 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/02/2017

                            By: Watson S.B. No. 1990
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2017; March 27, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; May 2, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 4, Nays  3; May 2, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to low income housing tax credits awarded for certain
 developments.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2306.6711, Government Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (j) to read as follows:
 (j)  Except as necessary to comply with the nonprofit
 set-aside required by Section 42(h)(5), Internal Revenue Code of
 1986 (26 U.S.C. Section 42(h)(5)), and except as otherwise provided
 by this subsection, in each urban subregion of a uniform state
 service region that contains a municipality with a population of
 285,000 or more, the board shall allocate housing tax credits to the
 highest scoring development, if any, that qualifies as a supportive
 housing project and is located in that urban subregion in a
 municipality with a population of 285,000 or more.  The department
 by rule shall establish requirements for a supportive housing
 project to qualify for housing tax credits under this subsection.
 The department is not required to award housing tax credits to more
 than the five highest scoring supportive housing projects under
 this subsection in an application cycle.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to the allocation of low income housing tax credits for an
 application cycle that begins on or after January 1, 2019. The
 allocation of low income housing tax credits for an application
 cycle that begins before January 1, 2019, is governed by the law in
 effect on the date the application cycle began, and the former law
 is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *