House | 05/20/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4004 | |
House | 05/16/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2187 | |
House | 05/01/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2187 | |
House | 03/28/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 912 | |
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 746 | |
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Statement(s) submitted | Journal Page: 692 | |
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 692 | |
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 692 | |
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 692 | |
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 692 | |
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 713 | |
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 646 | |
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 646 | |
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 646 | |
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 680 | |
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 629 | |
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 573 | |
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 548 | |
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 308 | |
Senate | 02/13/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 268 | |
Senate | 02/07/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 235 | |
Senate | 02/01/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 175 | |
Senate | 01/31/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 151 | |
Senate | 01/24/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 92 | |
Senate | 01/24/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 92 | |
Senate | 01/17/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 39 | |
Senate | 01/06/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/06/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |