Senate | 05/11/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/05/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/05/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/05/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 03/10/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |