Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2039 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-S.B. No. 2039
1+By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 2039
2+ (Thompson of Harris)
23
34
5+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
46 AN ACT
5- relating to the development and use of instructional modules and
6- training for public schools on the prevention of sexual abuse and
7- sex trafficking and participation by the human trafficking
8- prevention task force in that development.
7+ relating to the development of instructional modules and training
8+ for public schools on the prevention of sexual abuse and sex
9+ trafficking and participation by the human trafficking prevention
10+ task force in that development.
911 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1012 SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 28, Education Code, is
1113 amended by adding Section 28.017 to read as follows:
1214 Sec. 28.017. INSTRUCTION ON PREVENTION OF SEXUAL ABUSE AND
1315 SEX TRAFFICKING. (a) The commissioner, in cooperation with the
1416 human trafficking prevention task force created under Section
1517 402.035, Government Code, and any other persons the commissioner
1618 considers appropriate, shall develop one or more sexual abuse and
1719 sex trafficking instructional modules that a school district may
1820 use in the district's health curriculum. The modules may include:
1921 (1) information on the different forms of sexual abuse
2022 and assault, sex trafficking, and risk factors for sex trafficking;
2123 (2) the procedures for reporting sexual abuse and sex
2224 trafficking or suspected sexual abuse or sex trafficking;
2325 (3) strategies for sexual abuse and assault prevention
2426 and overcoming peer pressure;
2527 (4) information on establishing healthy boundaries
2628 for relationships, recognizing potentially abusive or harmful
2729 relationships, and avoiding high-risk activities;
2830 (5) the recruiting tactics of sex traffickers and peer
2931 recruiters, including recruitment through the Internet;
3032 (6) the legal aspects of sexual abuse and sex
3133 trafficking under state and federal law; and
3234 (7) the influence of culture and mass media on
3335 perceptions of sexual abuse and sex trafficking, including
3436 stereotypes and myths about victims and abusers, victim blaming,
3537 and the role of language.
3638 (b) The module or modules developed under Subsection (a)
3739 must emphasize compassion for victims of sexual abuse or sex
3840 trafficking and the creation of a positive reentry experience for
3941 survivors of sexual abuse or sex trafficking into schools.
40- (c) Before the beginning of each school year, a school
41- district that elects to use a module developed under Subsection (a)
42- in the district's health curriculum shall provide written notice to
43- the parent of each student enrolled in the district that includes
44- the following:
45- (1) a statement that the district will provide
46- instruction relating to sexual abuse and sex trafficking awareness
47- to students enrolled in the district;
48- (2) a description of the material that will be used in
49- providing instruction to students; and
50- (3) a statement that the parent has the right to review
51- the material and remove the parent's student from the instruction.
52- (d) If a school district does not comply with the
53- requirements of Subsection (c), a parent of a student enrolled in
54- the district may file a complaint in accordance with the district's
55- grievance procedure developed under Section 26.011.
5642 SECTION 2. Section 38.0041, Education Code, is amended by
5743 amending Subsections (a), (b), and (c) and adding Subsection (a-1)
5844 to read as follows:
5945 (a) Each school district and open-enrollment charter school
6046 shall adopt and implement a policy addressing sexual abuse, sex
6147 trafficking, and other maltreatment of children, to be included in
6248 the district improvement plan under Section 11.252 and any
6349 informational handbook provided to students and parents.
6450 (a-1) A school district may collaborate with local law
6551 enforcement and outside consultants with expertise in the
6652 prevention of sexual abuse and sex trafficking to create the policy
6753 required under Subsection (a), and to create a referral protocol
6854 for high-risk students.
6955 (b) A policy required by this section must address:
7056 (1) methods for increasing staff, student, and parent
7157 awareness of issues regarding sexual abuse, sex trafficking, and
7258 other maltreatment of children, including prevention techniques
7359 and knowledge of likely warning signs indicating that a child may be
7460 a victim of sexual abuse, sex trafficking, or other maltreatment,
7561 using resources developed by the agency under Section 38.004 or by
7662 the commissioner under Section 28.017;
7763 (2) actions that a child who is a victim of sexual
7864 abuse, sex trafficking, or other maltreatment should take to obtain
7965 assistance and intervention; and
8066 (3) available counseling options for students
8167 affected by sexual abuse, sex trafficking, or other maltreatment.
8268 (c) The methods under Subsection (b)(1) for increasing
8369 awareness of issues regarding sexual abuse, sex trafficking, and
8470 other maltreatment of children must include training, as provided
8571 by this subsection, concerning prevention techniques for and
8672 recognition of sexual abuse, sex trafficking, and all other
8773 maltreatment of children. The training:
8874 (1) must be provided, as part of a new employee
8975 orientation, to all new school district and open-enrollment charter
9076 school employees and to existing district and open-enrollment
9177 charter school employees on a schedule adopted by the agency by rule
9278 until all district and open-enrollment charter school employees
9379 have taken the training; and
9480 (2) must include training concerning:
9581 (A) factors indicating a child is at risk for
9682 sexual abuse, sex trafficking, or other maltreatment;
9783 (B) likely warning signs indicating a child may
9884 be a victim of sexual abuse, sex trafficking, or other
9985 maltreatment;
10086 (C) internal procedures for seeking assistance
10187 for a child who is at risk for sexual abuse, sex trafficking, or
10288 other maltreatment, including referral to a school counselor, a
10389 social worker, or another mental health professional;
10490 (D) techniques for reducing a child's risk of
10591 sexual abuse, sex trafficking, or other maltreatment; and
10692 (E) community organizations that have relevant
10793 existing research-based programs that are able to provide training
10894 or other education for school district or open-enrollment charter
10995 school staff members, students, and parents.
11096 SECTION 3. Section 402.035(h), Government Code, is amended
11197 to read as follows:
11298 (h) This section expires September 1, 2019 [2017].
11399 SECTION 4. This Act applies beginning with the 2017-2018
114100 school year.
115101 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect only if a specific
116102 appropriation for the implementation of the Act is provided in a
117103 general appropriations act of the 85th Legislature.
118104 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
119105 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
120106 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
121107 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
122108 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
123- ______________________________ ______________________________
124- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
125- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2039 passed the Senate on
126- May 8, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 27, Nays 4; and that the
127- Senate concurred in House amendment on May 28, 2017, by the
128- following vote: Yeas 26, Nays 5.
129- ______________________________
130- Secretary of the Senate
131- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2039 passed the House, with
132- amendment, on May 24, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 141,
133- Nays 5, two present not voting.
134- ______________________________
135- Chief Clerk of the House
136- Approved:
137- ______________________________
138- Date
139- ______________________________
140- Governor