Senate | 05/16/2017 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Referred to Education | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 03/10/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |