House | 05/10/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Read first time | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Passed | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/10/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |