Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2076 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2017

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2017

Enrolled

Bill May 27, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 14, 2017
Bill April 24, 2017