Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2079 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/08/2017

                    By: Taylor of Galveston S.B. No. 2079
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2017; March 28, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 May 8, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 1; May 8, 2017, sent
 to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2079 By:  Menéndez


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a requirement that a student's postsecondary transcript
 include the average or median grade awarded in each class.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 51, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 51.979 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.979.  TRANSPARENCY IN STUDENT TRANSCRIPTS. (a)  In
 this section, "general academic teaching institution" and "public
 junior college" have the meanings assigned by Section 61.003.
 (b)  Each general academic teaching institution and each
 public junior college shall include on a student's transcript, for
 each class attempted by the student, the average grade that was
 awarded to all students in the class. For a class for which letter
 grades are awarded, the institution or college shall include on the
 transcript the median grade of the letter grades awarded in the
 class. The institution or college shall place the average or median
 grade, as applicable, immediately to the right of the student's
 individual grade.
 (c)  Subsection (b) does not apply to a class:
 (1)  offered to students solely on a pass-fail basis or
 for independent study credit; or
 (2)  in which grades are reported for 10 students or
 fewer.
 (d)  The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board shall
 adopt rules to administer this section.
 SECTION 2.  The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board
 shall adopt the rules required by Section 51.979, Education Code,
 as added by this Act, as soon as practicable after this Act takes
 effect.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies
 beginning with classes offered in the 2018 spring semester.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *