Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2079 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Taylor of Galveston S.B. No. 2079
2+ (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2017; March 28, 2017, read
3+ first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
4+ May 8, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
5+ Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 1; May 8, 2017, sent
6+ to printer.)
7+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2079 By: Menéndez
28
39
410 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
511 AN ACT
612 relating to a requirement that a student's postsecondary transcript
713 include the average or median grade awarded in each class.
814 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
915 SECTION 1. Subchapter Z, Chapter 51, Education Code, is
1016 amended by adding Section 51.979 to read as follows:
1117 Sec. 51.979. TRANSPARENCY IN STUDENT TRANSCRIPTS. (a) In
1218 this section, "general academic teaching institution" and "public
1319 junior college" have the meanings assigned by Section 61.003.
1420 (b) Each general academic teaching institution and each
1521 public junior college shall include on a student's transcript, for
1622 each class attempted by the student, the average grade that was
1723 awarded to all students in the class. For a class for which letter
1824 grades are awarded, the institution or college shall include on the
1925 transcript the median grade of the letter grades awarded in the
2026 class. The institution or college shall place the average or median
2127 grade, as applicable, immediately to the right of the student's
2228 individual grade.
2329 (c) Subsection (b) does not apply to a class:
2430 (1) offered to students solely on a pass-fail basis or
2531 for independent study credit; or
2632 (2) in which grades are reported for 10 students or
2733 fewer.
2834 (d) The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board shall
2935 adopt rules to administer this section.
3036 SECTION 2. The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board
3137 shall adopt the rules required by Section 51.979, Education Code,
32- as added by this Act, not later than September 1, 2020.
38+ as added by this Act, as soon as practicable after this Act takes
39+ effect.
3340 SECTION 3. The change in law made by this Act applies
34- beginning with classes offered in the 2022 fall semester.
41+ beginning with classes offered in the 2018 spring semester.
3542 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
3643 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
3744 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
3845 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
3946 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
47+ * * * * *