Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2084 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/08/2017

                    By: Taylor of Galveston S.B. No. 2084
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2017; March 28, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; May 8, 2017,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 8, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2084 By:  Taylor of Collin


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to calculation of average daily attendance for public
 school students in blended learning programs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 42.005, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (g-1) to read as follows:
 (g-1)  The commissioner shall adopt rules to calculate
 average daily attendance for students participating in a blended
 learning program in which classroom instruction is supplemented
 with applied workforce learning opportunities, including
 participation of students in internships, externships, and
 apprenticeships.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2017-2018
 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *