| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2017; March 28, 2017, read |
---|
| 3 | + | first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources & |
---|
| 4 | + | Economic Development; April 12, 2017, reported favorably by the |
---|
| 5 | + | following vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0; April 12, 2017, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
2 | 7 | | |
---|
3 | 8 | | |
---|
4 | 9 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
5 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
6 | 11 | | relating to a study of the fees charged by the Railroad Commission |
---|
7 | 12 | | of Texas. |
---|
8 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 14 | | SECTION 1. DEFINITION. In this Act, "commission" means the |
---|
10 | 15 | | Railroad Commission of Texas. |
---|
11 | 16 | | SECTION 2. STUDY. (a) The commission shall conduct a |
---|
12 | 17 | | study to evaluate the ability of the commission to fund its |
---|
13 | 18 | | operations using fees. |
---|
14 | 19 | | (b) In conducting the study under Subsection (a) of this |
---|
15 | 20 | | section, the commission shall: |
---|
16 | 21 | | (1) identify and evaluate the fees charged by the |
---|
17 | 22 | | commission; |
---|
18 | 23 | | (2) identify and evaluate the costs to the commission |
---|
19 | 24 | | associated with the administration of permits and other programs |
---|
20 | 25 | | for which the commission charges fees; |
---|
21 | 26 | | (3) recommend any appropriate changes to the fee |
---|
22 | 27 | | structure of the commission so that fees charged by the commission |
---|
23 | 28 | | are sufficient to fund the administration of the program the fees |
---|
24 | 29 | | are associated with; and |
---|
25 | 30 | | (4) evaluate the effects of any changes recommended |
---|
26 | 31 | | under Subdivision (3) of this subsection on the budget of the |
---|
27 | 32 | | commission. |
---|
28 | 33 | | SECTION 3. REPORT. Not later than September 1, 2018, the |
---|
29 | 34 | | commission shall submit to the legislature a written report |
---|
30 | 35 | | containing the findings of the study conducted under this Act and |
---|
31 | 36 | | the commission's recommendations for any legislation resulting |
---|
32 | 37 | | from the study. |
---|
33 | 38 | | SECTION 4. EXPIRATION. This Act expires September 1, 2019. |
---|
34 | 39 | | SECTION 5. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect |
---|
35 | 40 | | immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members |
---|
36 | 41 | | elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas |
---|
37 | 42 | | Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for |
---|
38 | 43 | | immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|