Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2124 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/27/2017

                            By: Perry S.B. No. 2124
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2017; March 28, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Finance; April 27, 2017,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 2; April 27, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2124 By:  Hancock


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a pilot program for assisting certain recipients of
 public benefits to gain permanent self-sufficiency.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 531.02241 to read as follows:
 Sec. 531.02241.  PILOT PROGRAM FOR SELF-SUFFICIENCY OF
 CERTAIN PERSONS RECEIVING TEMPORARY ASSISTANCE FOR NEEDY FAMILIES
 BENEFITS OR OTHER SERVICES.  (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Financial assistance benefits" means money
 payments under the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF)
 program authorized by Chapter 31, Human Resources Code.
 (2)  "Living wage" means an amount of money, determined
 by a market-based calculation that uses geographically specific
 expenditure data, that is sufficient to meet a family's minimum
 necessary spending on basic needs, including food, child care,
 health insurance, housing, and transportation.
 (3)  "Self-sufficiency" means being employed in a
 position that pays a living wage, having financial savings in an
 amount that is equal to at least three months of living wage income,
 and owing only a reasonable amount of debt.
 (b)  The commission shall develop and implement a pilot
 program for assisting up to 100 eligible participants under this
 section to gain permanent self-sufficiency and no longer require
 financial assistance or other public benefits.
 (c)  The pilot program will test waiving, for at least 24
 months but not more than 60 months, income and asset limit
 eligibility requirements for financial assistance benefits. The
 waiver of any income limit requirement must be in an amount that
 does not exceed the amount, based on a participant's family makeup
 and the living wage in the participant's geographical area of
 residence, determined to be necessary for the purposes of the
 program. The waiver of any asset limit requirement must be in an
 amount that is equal to or less than three months of the
 participant's income.
 (d)  The pilot program must be designed to allow social
 services providers, public benefit offices, and other community
 partners to refer potential participants to the program.  A person
 is eligible to participate in the program established under this
 section if the person:
 (1)  is a recipient of financial assistance benefits;
 (2)  has a total household income that is less than a
 living wage based on the recipient's family makeup and geographical
 area of residence;
 (3)  is at least 18 but not more than 62 years of age;
 and
 (4)  is willing and legally able to be employed.
 (e)  The pilot program must be designed to assist eligible
 participants in attaining self-sufficiency by:
 (1)  identifying eligibility requirements for the
 benefits described by Subsection (d)(1) that may be waived for a
 limited period of time and that, if applied, would impede
 self-sufficiency;
 (2)  implementing strategies, including waiving the
 eligibility requirements identified in Subdivision (1), to remove
 barriers to self-sufficiency; and
 (3)  moving eligible participants through progressive
 stages toward self-sufficiency that include the following phases:
 (A)  an initial phase in which a participant moves
 out of an emergent crisis by securing housing, medical care, and
 financial assistance benefits;
 (B)  a second phase in which the participant moves
 toward stability by securing employment and, if necessary, child
 care and by participating in services that build the financial
 management skills necessary to meet financial goals;
 (C)  a third phase in which the participant
 transitions to self-sufficiency by securing employment that pays a
 living wage, reducing debt, and building savings; and
 (D)  a final phase in which the participant
 attains self-sufficiency by retaining employment that pays a living
 wage, amassing at least three months of living wage savings, and
 eliminating debt so that the participant will no longer be
 dependent on financial assistance or other public benefits.
 (f)  A person who wishes to participate in the pilot program
 must attend an in-person intake meeting with a program case
 manager. During the intake meeting the case manager shall:
 (1)  determine whether:
 (A)  the person meets the eligibility
 requirements under Subsection (d); and
 (B)  the income or asset limit eligibility
 requirements may be waived under the program;
 (2)  review the person's demographic information and
 household financial budget;
 (3)  assess the person's current financial and career
 situations;
 (4)  collaborate with the person to develop and
 implement strategies for removing barriers to attaining
 self-sufficiency, including waiving income and asset limit
 eligibility requirements for financial assistance benefits; and
 (5)  if the person is determined to be eligible for and
 chooses to participate in the program, schedule a follow-up meeting
 to further assess the person's crisis, review available referral
 services, and create a service plan.
 (g)  The pilot program must provide each participant with
 holistic, wraparound case management services to ensure that goals
 included in a participant's service plan are achieved. A
 participant must be assigned a program case manager who shall:
 (1)  if the participant is determined to be eligible,
 provide the participant with a waiver described by Subsection (c),
 allowing the participant to continue receiving financial
 assistance benefits;
 (2)  assess, at the follow-up meeting scheduled under
 Subsection (f)(5), the participant's crisis, review available
 referral services, and create a service plan; and
 (3)  during the initial phase of the program, create
 medium- and long-term goals consistent with the strategies
 developed under Subsection (f)(4).
 (h)  The pilot program established under this section must
 operate for at least 24 months.  The program shall also include 16
 additional months for:
 (1)  planning and designing the program before the
 program begins operation; and
 (2)  data collection and program evaluation after the
 program begins operation.
 (i)  The commission shall develop and implement the pilot
 program established under this section with the assistance of the
 Texas Workforce Commission, local workforce development boards,
 faith-based and other relevant public or private organizations, and
 any other entity or person the commission determines appropriate.
 (j)  The commission shall monitor and evaluate the pilot
 program in a manner that allows for promoting research-informed
 results of the program.
 (k)  On the conclusion of the pilot program but not later
 than 24 months following the date on which the program begins
 operation, the commission shall report to the legislature on the
 results of the program. The report must include:
 (1)  an evaluation of the program's effect on eligible
 participants in achieving self-sufficiency and no longer requiring
 public benefits;
 (2)  the impact to this state on the costs of the
 financial assistance benefits program and the child care management
 services program operated by the Texas Workforce Commission; and
 (3)  recommendations on the feasibility and
 continuation of the program.
 (l)  During the operation of the pilot program, the
 commission shall provide to the legislature additional reports
 concerning the program that the commission determines to be
 appropriate.
 (m)  The executive commissioner and the Texas Workforce
 Commission may adopt rules to implement this section.
 (n)  This section expires September 1, 2022.
 SECTION 2.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect only if a specific
 appropriation for the implementation of the Act is provided in a
 general appropriations act of the 85th Legislature.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *