Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2134 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/10/2017

                    85R7221 KKR-D
 By: Lucio S.B. No. 2134


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a plan to increase the use of telemedicine medical
 services and telehealth services in this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 1001, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Subchapter J to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER J. PLAN TO EXPAND TELEMEDICINE MEDICAL SERVICES AND
 TELEHEALTH SERVICES
 Sec. 1001.251.  ACTION PLAN. (a)  The department, with the
 assistance of the Texas Hospital Association, the Texas Medical
 Association, teaching hospitals, and the statewide health
 coordinating council, shall develop and implement an action plan
 to:
 (1)  expand the use of telemedicine medical services,
 telehealth services, and related mobile applications for those
 services to increase access by residents of this state to health
 care providers; and
 (2)  increase the availability of critical medical care
 and health care services to residents in this state in areas
 determined by the department to be medically underserved, including
 the border region and rural areas.
 (b)  The department shall consult with health care
 providers, advocacy groups, relevant federal agencies, and any
 other interested persons the department considers necessary to
 develop the action plan required by this section.
 Sec. 1001.252.  PLAN REQUIREMENTS. (a)  The action plan
 developed under Section 1001.251 must include:
 (1)   short-term and long-term plan recommendations,
 including policy initiatives and reforms necessary to implement the
 plan;
 (2)  statutory and administrative changes necessary to
 implement the plan; and
 (3)  options for the funding necessary to implement the
 plan.
 (b)  The department shall:
 (1)  not later than September 1, 2019:
 (A)  submit to the governor and the legislature
 the recommendations, the statutory and administrative changes, and
 the funding options described in Subsection (a) and short-term and
 long-term plans to implement those recommendations, changes, and
 options; and
 (B)  begin implementing the short-term plan;
 (2)  not later than September 1, 2021, fully implement
 the short-term plan;
 (3)  not later than September 1, 2027, fully implement
 the long-term plan; and
 (4)  include the short-term and long-term plans in the
 material the department prepares for consideration of the
 commission in connection with the update of the strategic plan for
 health and human services under Section 531.022, Government Code.
 Sec. 1001.253.  EXPIRATION. This subchapter expires
 September 1, 2027.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.