House | 05/20/2017 | Referred to Elections | ||
House | 05/20/2017 | Read first time | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Passed | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Amended | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Posting rule suspended | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/10/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |