Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2152 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/10/2017

                            85R3033 CBH-F
 By: Huffman S.B. No. 2152


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the transfer of certain unused franchise tax credits.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 18, Chapter 1 (H.B. 3), Acts of the 79th
 Legislature, 3rd Called Session, 2006, is amended by adding
 Subsections (h), (i), (j), (j-1), and (k) to read as follows:
 (h)  In this subsection and Subsection (i) of this section,
 "transfer" includes a sale. Notwithstanding Subsections (e) and (f)
 of this section, a corporation that had unused credits before
 January 1, 2008, under former Subchapter P or Q, Chapter 171, Tax
 Code, that expired under the terms of one of those former
 subchapters or under Subsection (e) or (f) of this section, may
 transfer the right to all or part of the expired credits to another
 taxpayer of this state. The taxpayer to whom a credit is transferred
 may apply the credit only as provided by Subsections (j) and (j-1)
 of this section. To be eligible to transfer all or part of the
 credits, the corporation must obtain a certificate of transfer of
 credit from the comptroller for the amount of the credits to be
 transferred. Not later than the 30th day after the date of the
 transfer, the corporation must submit to the comptroller a notice
 of the transfer in a form prescribed by the comptroller. The notice
 must be accompanied by a copy of the certificate of transfer issued
 by the comptroller and specify:
 (1)  the number on the certificate of transfer;
 (2)  the amount of the corporation's unused credits
 preceding the transfer;
 (3)  the date of the transfer;
 (4)  the total amount of credits transferred;
 (5)  the tax identification numbers of the corporation
 and the taxpayer to which the credit was transferred;
 (6)  the corporation's remaining amount of unused
 credits after the transfer; and
 (7)  any other information the comptroller requires.
 (i)  The transfer of a credit under Subsection (h) of this
 section is limited to an unused credit for which the corporation was
 eligible before January 1, 2008, and does not include credits
 authorized under former Subchapter Q-1, Chapter 171, Tax Code, or
 credits that were created under the terms of a written agreement
 between a taxpayer and the Texas Department of Economic Development
 or its successor that was entered into before June 1, 2006, and that
 continue to accrue under the terms provided by Section 19 of this
 Act. Subject to Subsection (j-1) of this section, the transferee of
 a credit under this section obtains the credit subject to the same
 rights and privileges as the transferor had on the date the credit
 was originally established. If a corporation transfers a credit
 that the corporation was not entitled to transfer at the time of the
 transfer:
 (1)  the taxpayer to which the credit was transferred
 may pursue any remedy authorized by law against the corporation and
 may not pursue any remedy against the comptroller or this state; and
 (2)  the comptroller or Texas Workforce Commission, as
 appropriate:
 (A)  may not allow the taxpayer to which the
 credit was transferred to apply the credit on a report for a tax or
 contribution listed in Subsection (j) of this section; or
 (B)  shall recover from the taxpayer the amount of
 the credit the taxpayer claims on a report using any means
 authorized by law.
 (j)  Subject to Subsection (j-1) of this section, a taxpayer
 to which a credit is transferred under Subsection (h) of this
 section may apply the credit against:
 (1)  the taxes due under Chapters 151, 152, 154, 155,
 156, 158, 160, 162, 171, 181, 182, 183, 191, 201, and 202, Tax Code;
 (2)  the occupation taxes due under Title 3, Insurance
 Code; and
 (3)  a contribution due under Subtitle A, Title 4,
 Labor Code.
 (j-1)  A taxpayer to which a credit is transferred under
 Subsection (h) of this section may apply the credit only:
 (1)  on or with a franchise tax report covering a period
 for which the transferring corporation would have been entitled to
 apply the transferred credit under Subsection (e) or (f) of this
 section, as appropriate, in the absence of a limitation on the
 amount of the credit for that period; and
 (2)  in relation to occupation taxes imposed under
 Title 3, Insurance Code, or other taxes and contributions paid to
 this state, during a period for which the transferring corporation
 would have been entitled to apply the transferred credit under
 Subsection (e) or (f) of this section, as appropriate, in the
 absence of a limitation on the amount of the credit for that period.
 (k)  A taxpayer to which an unused tax credit is transferred
 under Subsection (h) of this section may not apply the credit after
 August 31, 2019.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.