Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2187 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/10/2017

                            85R3254 BEE-F
 By: West S.B. No. 2187


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the renewal of a certificate of registration by certain
 interior designers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1051.351(c-1), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), a person who holds a
 certificate of registration issued under Chapter 1053 without
 examination may not renew the certificate on or after September 1,
 2027 [2017], unless, before September 1, 2027 [2017], the person
 has passed the registration examination adopted by the board under
 Section 1053.154 and in effect on January 1, 2014.  This subsection
 expires January 1, 2029 [2019].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.