Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2212 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2017

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2017

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 15, 2017
Bill April 18, 2017