House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5093
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5093
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5093
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3258
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3258
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 3258
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3258
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3256
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2965
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4602
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1717
|
Journal Page: 4601
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4601
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4601
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 4580
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4468
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1669
|
Journal Page: 4467
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4467
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Parker
|
Journal Page: 4465
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4465
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4004
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 3484
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3484
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1685
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1228
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1157
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1157
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1157
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1157
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1157
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1156
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1142
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 958
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2017
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 118
|
Senate
|
01/25/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 118
|
Senate
|
11/14/2016
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2016
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|