Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2240 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/24/2017

                    By: Taylor of Galveston S.B. No. 2240
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2017; March 29, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 April 24, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 24, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2240 By:  Taylor of Galveston


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to notice of health benefit plan provider network status
 provided by certain freestanding emergency medical care
 facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 241.252, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsections (e) and
 (f) to read as follows:
 (b)  A facility described by Section 241.251 shall post
 notice that:
 (1)  states:
 (A) [(1)  that] the facility is a freestanding
 emergency medical care facility;
 (B) [(2)  that] the facility charges rates
 comparable to a hospital emergency room and may charge a facility
 fee;
 (C) [(3)  that] a facility or a physician
 providing medical care at the facility may not be a participating
 provider in the patient's health benefit plan provider network; and
 (D) [(4)  that] a physician providing medical
 care at the facility may bill separately from the facility for the
 medical care provided to a patient; and
 (2)  either:
 (A)  lists the health benefit plans in which the
 facility is a participating provider in the health benefit plan's
 provider network; or
 (B)  states the facility is not a participating
 provider in any health benefit plan provider network.
 (e)  Notwithstanding Subsection (c), a facility that is a
 participating provider in one or more health benefit plan provider
 networks complies with Subsection (b)(2) if the facility:
 (1)  provides notice on the facility's Internet website
 listing the health benefit plans in which the facility is a
 participating provider in the health benefit plan's provider
 network; and
 (2)  provides to a patient written confirmation of
 whether the facility is a participating provider in the patient's
 health benefit plan's provider network.
 (f)  A facility described by Section 241.251 may not include
 in any of the facility's signage or marketing materials the logo or
 name of any insurer, health maintenance organization, health
 benefit plan, or health benefit plan network in which the facility
 does not participate.
 SECTION 2.  Section 254.155, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (d) and
 (e) to read as follows:
 (a)  A facility shall post notice that:
 (1)  states:
 (A) [(1)  that] the facility is a freestanding
 emergency medical care facility;
 (B) [(2)  that] the facility charges rates
 comparable to a hospital emergency room and may charge a facility
 fee;
 (C) [(3)  that] a facility or a physician
 providing medical care at the facility may not be a participating
 provider in the patient's health benefit plan provider network; and
 (D) [(4)  that] a physician providing medical
 care at the facility may bill separately from the facility for the
 medical care provided to a patient; and
 (2)  either:
 (A)  lists the health benefit plans in which the
 facility is a participating provider in the health benefit plan's
 provider network; or
 (B)  states the facility is not a participating
 provider in any health benefit plan provider network.
 (d)  Notwithstanding Subsection (b), a facility that is a
 participating provider in one or more health benefit plan provider
 networks complies with Subsection (a)(2) if the facility:
 (1)  provides notice on the facility's Internet website
 listing the health benefit plans in which the facility is a
 participating provider in the health benefit plan's provider
 network; and
 (2)  provides to a patient written confirmation of
 whether the facility is a participating provider in the patient's
 health benefit plan's provider network.
 (e)  A facility may not include in any of the facility's
 signage or marketing materials the logo or name of any insurer,
 health maintenance organization, health benefit plan, or health
 benefit plan network in which the facility does not participate.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *