2 | | - | (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2017; March 29, 2017, read |
---|
3 | | - | first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce; |
---|
4 | | - | April 24, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee |
---|
5 | | - | Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 24, 2017, |
---|
6 | | - | sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | | - | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
8 | | - | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2240 By: Taylor of Galveston |
---|
21 | | - | notice that: |
---|
22 | | - | (1) states: |
---|
23 | | - | (A) [(1) that] the facility is a freestanding |
---|
24 | | - | emergency medical care facility; |
---|
25 | | - | (B) [(2) that] the facility charges rates |
---|
26 | | - | comparable to a hospital emergency room and may charge a facility |
---|
27 | | - | fee; |
---|
28 | | - | (C) [(3) that] a facility or a physician |
---|
29 | | - | providing medical care at the facility may not be a participating |
---|
30 | | - | provider in the patient's health benefit plan provider network; and |
---|
31 | | - | (D) [(4) that] a physician providing medical |
---|
32 | | - | care at the facility may bill separately from the facility for the |
---|
33 | | - | medical care provided to a patient; and |
---|
34 | | - | (2) either: |
---|
35 | | - | (A) lists the health benefit plans in which the |
---|
36 | | - | facility is a participating provider in the health benefit plan's |
---|
| 13 | + | notice that states: |
---|
| 14 | + | (1) that the facility is a freestanding emergency |
---|
| 15 | + | medical care facility and not an urgent care center; |
---|
| 16 | + | (2) that the facility charges rates comparable to a |
---|
| 17 | + | hospital emergency room and may charge a facility fee; |
---|
| 18 | + | (3) [that a facility or a physician providing medical |
---|
| 19 | + | care at the facility may not be a participating provider in the |
---|
| 20 | + | patient's health benefit plan provider network; and |
---|
| 21 | + | [(4)] that a physician providing medical care at the |
---|
| 22 | + | facility may bill separately from the facility for the medical care |
---|
| 23 | + | provided to a patient; |
---|
| 24 | + | (4) any facility fee charged by the facility will be |
---|
| 25 | + | disclosed at the time of service to a patient upon request; and |
---|
| 26 | + | (5) either: |
---|
| 27 | + | (A) that the facility does not participate in a |
---|
38 | | - | (B) states the facility is not a participating |
---|
39 | | - | provider in any health benefit plan provider network. |
---|
40 | | - | (e) Notwithstanding Subsection (c), a facility that is a |
---|
41 | | - | participating provider in one or more health benefit plan provider |
---|
42 | | - | networks complies with Subsection (b)(2) if the facility: |
---|
43 | | - | (1) provides notice on the facility's Internet website |
---|
44 | | - | listing the health benefit plans in which the facility is a |
---|
45 | | - | participating provider in the health benefit plan's provider |
---|
46 | | - | network; and |
---|
47 | | - | (2) provides to a patient written confirmation of |
---|
48 | | - | whether the facility is a participating provider in the patient's |
---|
49 | | - | health benefit plan's provider network. |
---|
50 | | - | (f) A facility described by Section 241.251 may not include |
---|
51 | | - | in any of the facility's signage or marketing materials the logo or |
---|
52 | | - | name of any insurer, health maintenance organization, health |
---|
53 | | - | benefit plan, or health benefit plan network in which the facility |
---|
54 | | - | does not participate. |
---|
| 29 | + | (B) that the facility participates in a provider |
---|
| 30 | + | network. |
---|
| 31 | + | (6) State and federal laws require health plans to |
---|
| 32 | + | cover emergency services at the in network level of benefits. An |
---|
| 33 | + | out-of-network provider can bill you for amounts in addition to the |
---|
| 34 | + | applicable copay, coinsurance and deductible amounts. Depending on |
---|
| 35 | + | your health benefit plan, you may be responsible for all charges in |
---|
| 36 | + | excess of your health plan's allowable amount for out-of-network |
---|
| 37 | + | providers. |
---|
56 | | - | amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (d) and |
---|
57 | | - | (e) to read as follows: |
---|
58 | | - | (a) A facility shall post notice that: |
---|
59 | | - | (1) states: |
---|
60 | | - | (A) [(1) that] the facility is a freestanding |
---|
61 | | - | emergency medical care facility; |
---|
62 | | - | (B) [(2) that] the facility charges rates |
---|
63 | | - | comparable to a hospital emergency room and may charge a facility |
---|
64 | | - | fee; |
---|
65 | | - | (C) [(3) that] a facility or a physician |
---|
66 | | - | providing medical care at the facility may not be a participating |
---|
67 | | - | provider in the patient's health benefit plan provider network; and |
---|
68 | | - | (D) [(4) that] a physician providing medical |
---|
69 | | - | care at the facility may bill separately from the facility for the |
---|
70 | | - | medical care provided to a patient; and |
---|
71 | | - | (2) either: |
---|
72 | | - | (A) lists the health benefit plans in which the |
---|
73 | | - | facility is a participating provider in the health benefit plan's |
---|
| 39 | + | amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to |
---|
| 40 | + | read as follows: |
---|
| 41 | + | (a) A facility shall post notice that states: |
---|
| 42 | + | (1) that the facility is a freestanding emergency |
---|
| 43 | + | medical care facility and not an urgent care center; |
---|
| 44 | + | (2) that the facility charges rates comparable to a |
---|
| 45 | + | hospital emergency room and may charge a facility fee; |
---|
| 46 | + | (3) [that a facility or a physician providing medical |
---|
| 47 | + | care at the facility may not be a participating provider in the |
---|
| 48 | + | patient's health benefit plan provider network; and |
---|
| 49 | + | [(4)] that a physician providing medical care at the |
---|
| 50 | + | facility may bill separately from the facility for the medical care |
---|
| 51 | + | provided to a patient; |
---|
| 52 | + | (4) any facility fee charged by the facility will be |
---|
| 53 | + | disclosed at the time of service to a patient upon request; and |
---|
| 54 | + | (5) either: |
---|
| 55 | + | (A) that the facility does not participate in a |
---|
75 | | - | (B) states the facility is not a participating |
---|
76 | | - | provider in any health benefit plan provider network. |
---|
77 | | - | (d) Notwithstanding Subsection (b), a facility that is a |
---|
78 | | - | participating provider in one or more health benefit plan provider |
---|
79 | | - | networks complies with Subsection (a)(2) if the facility: |
---|
80 | | - | (1) provides notice on the facility's Internet website |
---|
81 | | - | listing the health benefit plans in which the facility is a |
---|
82 | | - | participating provider in the health benefit plan's provider |
---|
83 | | - | network; and |
---|
84 | | - | (2) provides to a patient written confirmation of |
---|
85 | | - | whether the facility is a participating provider in the patient's |
---|
86 | | - | health benefit plan's provider network. |
---|
87 | | - | (e) A facility may not include in any of the facility's |
---|
88 | | - | signage or marketing materials the logo or name of any insurer, |
---|
89 | | - | health maintenance organization, health benefit plan, or health |
---|
90 | | - | benefit plan network in which the facility does not participate. |
---|
91 | | - | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|
92 | | - | * * * * * |
---|
| 57 | + | (B) that the facility participates in a provider |
---|
| 58 | + | network. |
---|
| 59 | + | (6) State and federal laws require health plans to |
---|
| 60 | + | cover emergency services at the in network level of benefits. An |
---|
| 61 | + | out-of-network provider can bill you for amounts in addition to the |
---|
| 62 | + | applicable copay, coinsurance and deductible amounts. Depending on |
---|
| 63 | + | your health benefit plan, you may be responsible for all charges in |
---|
| 64 | + | excess of your health plan's allowable amount for out-of-network |
---|
| 65 | + | providers. |
---|
| 66 | + | SECTION 3. Notwithstanding Sections 241.252 and 254.155, |
---|
| 67 | + | Health and Safety Code, as amended by this Act, a freestanding |
---|
| 68 | + | emergency medical care facility is not required to comply with |
---|
| 69 | + | those provisions until January 1, 2018. |
---|
| 70 | + | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|