Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2244 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 15, 2017

Engrossed

Bill May 8, 2017

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2017
Bill May 2, 2017