|
06/12/2017
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
|
06/12/2017
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
|
|
05/23/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
House passage reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Referred to Special Purpose Districts
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Recommendations filed with the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|