Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB226 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/06/2017

                    By: Taylor of Collin S.B. No. 226
 (In the Senate - Filed November 16, 2016; January 30, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Water &
 Rural Affairs; April 6, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 2;
 April 6, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 226 By:  Perry


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the procedure for action on certain applications for an
 amendment to a water right.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.122, Water Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  In addition to an application that meets the
 requirements of Subsection (b) and for which the commission has
 determined that notice or an opportunity for a contested case
 hearing is not required under another statute or a commission rule,
 an application for an amendment to a water right is exempt from any
 requirements of a statute or commission rule regarding notice and
 hearing or technical review by the executive director or the
 commission and may not be referred to the State Office of
 Administrative Hearings for a contested case hearing if the
 executive director determines after an administrative review that
 the application is for an amendment that:
 (1)  adds a purpose of use that does not substantially
 alter:
 (A)  the nature of the right from a right
 authorizing only nonconsumptive use to a right authorizing
 consumptive use; or
 (B)  a pattern of use that is explicitly
 authorized in or required by the original right;
 (2)  adds a place of use located in the same basin as
 the place of use authorized by the original right; or
 (3)  changes the point of diversion, provided that:
 (A)  the authorized rate of diversion is not
 increased;
 (B)  the original point of diversion and the new
 point of diversion are located in the same contiguous tract of land;
 (C)  the original point of diversion and the new
 point of diversion are from the same source of supply;
 (D)  there are no points of diversion from the
 same source of supply associated with other water rights that are
 located between the original point of diversion and the new point of
 diversion;
 (E)  there are no streamflow gauges located on the
 source of supply between the original point of diversion and the new
 point of diversion that are referenced in the original water right
 or in another water right authorizing a diversion from the same
 source of supply; and
 (F)  there are no tributary watercourses that
 enter the watercourse that is the source of supply located between
 the original point of diversion and the new point of diversion.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies to an application to amend a
 water right that is filed with the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality on or after the effective date of this Act or
 is pending as of the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *