Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2262 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-S.B. No. 2262
1+By: Perry S.B. No. 2262
2+ (Burns)
23
34
5+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
46 AN ACT
57 relating to the dissolution of the Central Colorado River
68 Authority.
79 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
810 SECTION 1. DEFINITIONS. In this Act:
911 (1) "Authority" means the Central Colorado River
1012 Authority.
1113 (2) "Commission" means the Texas Commission on
1214 Environmental Quality.
1315 (3) "County" means Coleman County.
1416 SECTION 2. MEMORANDUM OF UNDERSTANDING; TRANSFER OF ASSETS.
1517 (a) Not later than December 31, 2017, the authority and the county
1618 shall enter into a memorandum of understanding that governs the
1719 transfer of the following by the authority to the county:
1820 (1) the authority's remaining financial assets, after
1921 the discharge of any debts of the authority, in the form of cash,
2022 investments, and proceeds from the sale of the authority's personal
2123 property and real property, including lakes, reservoirs, dams,
2224 water rights, and other real property related to the lakes,
2325 reservoirs, or dams of the authority; and
2426 (2) the authority's remaining personal property and
2527 real property, including lakes, reservoirs, dams, water rights, and
2628 other real property related to the lakes, reservoirs, or dams of the
2729 authority in the event the property does not sell before December
2830 31, 2018.
2931 (b) The memorandum of understanding must include:
3032 (1) a timeline for the sale of the authority's personal
3133 property and real property, including the authority's lakes,
3234 reservoirs, dams, water rights, and other real property related to
3335 the lakes, reservoirs, or dams of the authority;
3436 (2) the acts necessary to complete the sale of the
3537 authority's lakes, reservoirs, dams, water rights, and other real
3638 property related to the lakes, reservoirs, or dams of the authority
3739 to third parties before December 31, 2018, in accordance with state
3840 law governing the sale of property by a political subdivision of
3941 this state, including Chapter 272, Local Government Code; and
4042 (3) the acts necessary to complete the transfer of the
4143 authority's lakes, reservoirs, dams, water rights, and other real
4244 property related to the lakes, reservoirs, or dams of the authority
4345 to the county in accordance with the rules of the commission, the
4446 Water Code, and other applicable law, in the event the property does
4547 not sell before December 31, 2018.
4648 (c) Section 8505.107, Special District Local Laws Code,
4749 does not apply to a transfer, sale, conveyance, or owner
4850 disposition of personal or real property by the authority in
4951 accordance with the memorandum of understanding entered into under
5052 this section.
5153 (d) Notwithstanding Section 81.032, Local Government Code,
5254 the county may accept the donation of:
5355 (1) the authority's financial assets, including cash,
5456 investments, and proceeds from the sale of the authority's personal
5557 property and real property, including lakes, reservoirs, dams,
5658 water rights, and other real property related to the lakes,
5759 reservoirs, or dams of the authority; and
5860 (2) the authority's personal property and real
5961 property, including lakes, reservoirs, dams, water rights, and
6062 other real property related to the lakes, reservoirs, or dams of the
6163 authority, in the event the property does not sell before December
6264 31, 2018.
6365 (e) Not later than December 31, 2018, all actions described
6466 in the memorandum of understanding entered into under this section
6567 must be completed.
6668 SECTION 3. DISSOLUTION OF DISTRICT. After the completion
6769 of the activities in the memorandum of understanding described by
6870 Section 2 of this Act, the authority is dissolved.
6971 SECTION 4. AMENDMENT. Section 325.025(b), Government Code,
7072 is amended to read as follows:
7173 (b) This section applies to the:
7274 (1) Angelina and Neches River Authority;
7375 (2) Bandera County River Authority and Groundwater
7476 District;
7577 (3) Brazos River Authority;
7678 (4) [Central Colorado River Authority;
7779 [(5)] Guadalupe-Blanco River Authority;
7880 (5) [(6)] Lavaca-Navidad River Authority;
7981 (6) [(7)] Lower Colorado River Authority;
8082 (7) [(8)] Lower Neches Valley Authority;
8183 (8) [(9)] Nueces River Authority;
8284 (9) [(10)] Palo Duro River Authority of Texas;
8385 (10) [(11)] Red River Authority of Texas;
8486 (11) [(12)] Sabine River Authority of Texas;
8587 (12) [(13)] San Antonio River Authority;
8688 (13) [(14)] San Jacinto River Authority;
8789 (14) [(15)] Sulphur River Basin Authority;
8890 (15) [(16)] Trinity River Authority of Texas;
8991 (16) [(17)] Upper Colorado River Authority; and
9092 (17) [(18)] Upper Guadalupe River Authority.
9193 SECTION 5. REPEALER. Chapter 8505, Special District Local
9294 Laws Code, is repealed.
9395 SECTION 6. NOTICE. (a) The legal notice of the intention
9496 to introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this
9597 Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a
9698 copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies,
9799 officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished
98100 under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313,
99101 Government Code.
100102 (b) The governor, one of the required recipients, has
101103 submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on
102104 Environmental Quality.
103105 (c) The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed
104106 its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor, the
105107 lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
106108 representatives within the required time.
107109 (d) All requirements of the constitution and laws of this
108110 state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect
109111 to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled
110112 and accomplished.
111113 SECTION 7. EFFECTIVE DATE. (a) Except as provided by
112114 Subsection (b) of this section, this Act takes effect September 1,
113115 2017.
114116 (b) Sections 4 and 5 of this Act take effect January 1, 2019.
115- ______________________________ ______________________________
116- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
117- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2262 passed the Senate on
118- April 19, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
119- ______________________________
120- Secretary of the Senate
121- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2262 passed the House on
122- May 24, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 4, two
123- present not voting.
124- ______________________________
125- Chief Clerk of the House
126- Approved:
127- ______________________________
128- Date
129- ______________________________
130- Governor