House | 05/05/2017 | Referred to Special Purpose Districts | ||
Senate | 05/05/2017 | Recommendations filed with the Senate | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Read first time | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Passed | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |