Senate | 05/11/2017 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Recommendations filed with the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | ||
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |