Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2292 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/26/2017

                            S.B. No. 2292


 relating to the powers and duties of the Meyer Ranch Municipal
 Utility District of Comal County; affecting an existing limited
 power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds;
 providing authority to impose fees and taxes.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle F, Title 6, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended by adding Chapter 7989 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 7989.  MEYER RANCH MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT OF COMAL
 COUNTY
 SUBCHAPTER A.  GENERAL PROVISIONS
 Sec. 7989.001.  DEFINITION.  In this chapter, "district"
 means the Meyer Ranch Municipal Utility District of Comal County.
 Sec. 7989.002.  NATURE OF DISTRICT.  The district is a
 municipal utility district created under Section 59, Article XVI,
 Texas Constitution.
 Sec. 7989.003.  FINDINGS OF PUBLIC PURPOSE AND BENEFIT.
 (a)  The district is created to serve a public purpose and benefit.
 (b)  The district is created to accomplish the purposes of:
 (1)  a municipal utility district as provided by
 general law and Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution; and
 (2)  Section 52, Article III, Texas Constitution, that
 relate to the construction, acquisition, improvement, operation,
 or maintenance of macadamized, graveled, or paved roads, or
 improvements, including storm drainage, in aid of those roads.
 SUBCHAPTER B.  POWERS AND DUTIES
 Sec. 7989.051.  GENERAL POWERS AND DUTIES.  The district has
 the powers and duties necessary to accomplish the purposes for
 which the district is created.
 Sec. 7989.052.  MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT POWERS AND
 DUTIES.  The district has the powers and duties provided by the
 general law of this state, including Chapters 49 and 54, Water Code,
 applicable to municipal utility districts created under Section 59,
 Article XVI, Texas Constitution.
 Sec. 7989.053.  AUTHORITY FOR ROAD PROJECTS. Under Section
 52, Article III, Texas Constitution, the district may design,
 acquire, construct, finance, issue bonds for, improve, operate,
 maintain, and convey to this state, a county, or a municipality for
 operation and maintenance macadamized, graveled, or paved roads, or
 improvements, including storm drainage, in aid of those roads.
 Sec. 7989.054.  ROAD STANDARDS AND REQUIREMENTS. (a)  A
 road project must meet all applicable construction standards,
 zoning and subdivision requirements, and regulations of each
 municipality in whose corporate limits or extraterritorial
 jurisdiction the road project is located.
 (b)  If a road project is not located in the corporate limits
 or extraterritorial jurisdiction of a municipality, the road
 project must meet all applicable construction standards,
 subdivision requirements, and regulations of each county in which
 the road project is located.
 (c)  If the state will maintain and operate the road, the
 Texas Transportation Commission must approve the plans and
 specifications of the road project.
 Sec. 7989.055.  LIMITATION ON USE OF EMINENT DOMAIN.
 (a)  The district may not exercise the power of eminent domain
 outside the boundaries of the district for any purpose unless the
 proposed exercise is approved by a written resolution of the
 commissioners court of each county in which the district is
 located.
 (b)  The district may not exercise the power of eminent
 domain before the entire board of directors is composed of
 directors elected by the residents of the district.
 Sec. 7989.056.  COMPLIANCE WITH MARCH 2016 AGREEMENT. On
 the date the district becomes a permittee under Texas Pollutant
 Discharge Elimination System Permit No. WQ0015314001, the district
 shall exercise any power necessary to comply with all applicable
 terms of the "Settlement Agreement" of March 29, 2016, between
 Randolph Todd Company, LLC and:
 (1)  Patricia and Troy Brand;
 (2)  Ellen McClellan;
 (3)  Edward Harris;
 (4)  Phyllis Yvonne Ritter;
 (5)  Carole Farmer;
 (6)  Nelda and Ronald Davis;
 (7)  Susan Dooley Logue;
 (8)  Randall and Nancy Pappas;
 (9)  Daniel and Michele Laroe;
 (10)  Elizabeth Martin;
 (11)  Ted Martin;
 (12)  Taylor Martin;
 (13)  Hector X. Amaya;
 (14)  Sabrina Houser-Amaya;
 (15)  Franklin Houser; and
 (16)  Bonnie Houser.
 SUBCHAPTER C.  BONDS AND OTHER OBLIGATIONS
 Sec. 7989.101.  AUTHORITY TO ISSUE BONDS AND OTHER
 OBLIGATIONS. (a)  The district may issue bonds or other
 obligations payable wholly or partly from ad valorem taxes, impact
 fees, revenue, contract payments, grants, or other district money,
 or any combination of those sources, to pay for a road project
 authorized by Section 7989.053.
 (b)  The district may not issue bonds payable from ad valorem
 taxes to finance a road project unless the issuance is approved by a
 vote of a two-thirds majority of the district voters voting at an
 election held for that purpose.
 Sec. 7989.102.  TAXES FOR BONDS.  At the time the district
 issues bonds payable wholly or partly from ad valorem taxes, the
 board shall provide for the annual imposition of a continuing
 direct ad valorem tax, without limit as to rate or amount, while all
 or part of the bonds are outstanding as required and in the manner
 provided by Sections 54.601 and 54.602, Water Code.
 Sec. 7989.103.  BONDS FOR ROAD PROJECTS. At the time of
 issuance, the total principal amount of bonds or other obligations
 issued or incurred to finance road projects and payable from ad
 valorem taxes may not exceed one-fourth of the assessed value of the
 real property in the district.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  The legal notice of the intention to
 introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this
 Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a
 copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies,
 officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished
 under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313,
 Government Code.
 (b)  The governor, one of the required recipients, has
 submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality.
 (c)  The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed
 its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
 representatives within the required time.
 (d)  All requirements of the constitution and laws of this
 state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect
 to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled
 and accomplished.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2292 passed the Senate on
 May 19, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2292 passed the House on
 May 24, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 137, Nays 9, two
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor