Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Recommendations filed with the Senate
|
|
|
|
06/12/2017
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
|
06/12/2017
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
|
|
05/28/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
House passage reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Referred to Special Purpose Districts
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Reported favorably as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|